Financial history THE ST JAMES CLERKENWELL CHARITY

Charity number: 278682
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/08/2017 01/08/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £28.09k £29.07k £697.95k £708.96k £613.60k
Total expenditure £30.33k £35.33k £719.18k £625.81k £656.82k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A £41.51k N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £41.51k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £321.98k £553.23k £376.83k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £331.96k £0 £205.13k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 £129.17k £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £33.31k £26.56k £28.56k
Income - Other N/A N/A £10.70k £0 £3.08k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £719.18k £625.81k £656.82k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 £1.00k £750
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £51.66k £28.56k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0