Financial history DAWLIFFE HALL EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 278720
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £3.06m £1.53m £5.07m £2.53m £3.69m
Total expenditure £1.36m £999.33k £1.18m £1.45m £1.09m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £36.14k £39.31k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.25m £721.63k £1.21m £869.13k £759.14k
Income - Other trading activities £209.39k £150.72k £352.72k £224.99k £79.38k
Income - Charitable activities £825.89k £654.79k £662.07k £505.56k £578.84k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £390 £3.10k £314.14k £11.32k £8.07k
Income - Other £775.00k £0 £2.83m £918.17k £2.27m
Income - Legacies £650.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.28m £999.32k £1.18m £1.37m £1.09m
Expenditure - Raising funds £118 £18 £311 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £240.60k £231.35k £361.09k £14.40k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £64.25k £69.10k £89.81k £68.93k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £85.29k £0 £0 £85.28k £0