Accounts and annual returns THE YOUNG MARKSMAN'S TRUST FUND

Charity number: 278820
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 15 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 08 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required