Financial history THE YOUNG MARKSMAN'S TRUST FUND

Charity number: 278820
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £5.30k £5.24k £10.31k £6.57k £5.89k
Total expenditure £6.31k £10.60k £5.93k £9.03k £6.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A