TOTTERDOWN CHILDREN'S COMMUNITY WORKSHOP

Charity number: 278840
Charity reporting is up to date (36 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 March 2021 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 March 2021 36 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 13 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 13 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 08 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 20 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 20 December 2016 On time Download