TOTTERDOWN CHILDREN'S COMMUNITY WORKSHOP

Charity number: 278840
Charity reporting is up to date (36 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hugh Reynolds Trustee 02 July 2017 None on record
Sarah McQuatt Trustee 03 October 2018 None on record
Helen Elizabeth Broadbent Trustee 11 September 2019 None on record
Gillian Cox Trustee 16 January 2019 None on record
Jane Tingay Chair 20 October 2016 None on record