Evelyn Partners Charitable Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants are made to other registered charities (not individuals) recommended by the Trustees and by staff of the Evelyn Partners Group of Companies. Unsolicited applications are not accepted.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 December 1979: Standard registration
- CASTLE EDUCATIONAL TRUST (Working name)
- THE TOWRY CHARITABLE TRUST ALSO KNOWN AS CASTLE EDUCATIONAL TRUST (Previous name)
- THE TOWRY LAW CHARITABLE TRUST ALSO KNOWN AS CASTLE EDUCATIONAL TRUST (Previous name)
- TILNEY CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- TOWRY LAW CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL MARTIN FRASER FRAME | Chair | 31 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Murphy | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Davies | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bennedetta Peto | Trustee | 28 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Louise Parcolazo-Rudge | Trustee | 03 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.24k | £101.11k | £47.97k | £51.19k | £54.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.77k | £74.64k | £103.60k | £112.92k | £142.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 February 2021 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 26 OCTOBER 1979 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION PASSED 1 SEPTEMBER 1980, DEED DATED 19 FEBRUARY 2009 AND DEED DATED 1 JULY 2010. AS AMENDED ON 28 FEB 2017 as amended on 28 Jun 2022 as amended on 28 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PERSONS UP TO THE AGE OF TWENTY-FIVE YEARS (OR SUCH LATER AGE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE IN ANY PARTICULAR CASE HAVING REGARD TO THE CIRCUMSTANCES OF THE YOUNG PERSONS CONCERNED) INSOFAR AS THE SAME MAY BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE LEGAL MEANING OF THE TERM; AND (2) ANY OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS WITHIN THE LEGAL MEANING OF THE TERM AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 Gresham Street
LONDON
EC2V 7BG
- Phone:
- 020 7131 4220
- Email:
- group.secretariat@evelyn.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window