Accounts and annual returns ST BEDE'S SCHOOL TRUST SUSSEX

Charity number: 278950
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 03 April 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 03 April 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 25 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 08 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 17 August 2020 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 17 August 2020 48 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 30 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 30 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window