Accounts and annual returns ST IVE RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 278961
Charity reporting is overdue by 142 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 142 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 142 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 March 2022 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required