WORLD ARABIAN HORSE ORGANIZATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote public interest in and the science of the breeding of Arabian horses; to advance education for the benefit of the public about horses, horse welfare and Arabian horses in particular; to promote and facilitate the acquisition and distribution of knowledge in all countries of the history, care and treatment of the Arabian breed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Algeria
- Argentina
- Australia
- Austria
- Azerbaijan
- Bahrain
- Belgium
- Belize
- Bolivia
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Brazil
- Brunei
- Bulgaria
- Canada
- Chile
- China
- Colombia
- Croatia
- Cuba
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Ecuador
- Egypt
- Estonia
- Finland
- France
- Germany
- Greece
- Hungary
- India
- Indonesia
- Iran
- Iraq
- Ireland
- Israel
- Italy
- Japan
- Jordan
- Kazakhstan
- Kuwait
- Lebanon
- Libya
- Lithuania
- Luxembourg
- Macedonia
- Malaysia
- Malta
- Mexico
- Montenegro
- Morocco
- Namibia
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Northern Ireland
- Norway
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Oman
- Pakistan
- Panama
- Paraguay
- Peru
- Philippines
- Poland
- Portugal
- Qatar
- Romania
- Russia
- Saudi Arabia
- Scotland
- Serbia
- Singapore
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- South Africa
- South Korea
- Spain
- Sudan
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Syria
- Taiwan
- Thailand
- Tunisia
- Turkey
- Ukraine
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
- Uruguay
- Venezuela
- Vietnam
- Yemen
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 17 December 1979: Standard registration
- WAHO (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER POND | Chair | 01 January 1996 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE SUSSEX | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|||||
SAMI JASSIM AL BOENAIN | Trustee | 14 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
HRH PRINCESS ALIA AL HUSSEIN | Trustee | 10 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
ALI SHAARAWI | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT FAULS JR | Trustee | 16 March 2010 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD PIKE | Trustee | 16 March 2010 |
|
|
||||
XAVIER GUIBERT | Trustee | 01 November 2006 |
|
|
||||
Dr MAREK TRELA | Trustee | 01 January 2005 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE BUNTING | Trustee | 01 October 1998 |
|
|
||||
BASIL JADAAN | Trustee | 01 November 1996 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.46k | £124.29k | £142.64k | £144.29k | £133.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £110.33k | £111.12k | £132.21k | £130.18k | £126.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 26 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 26 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON THE 4TH SEPTEMBER 1978
Charitable objects
A) TO PRESERVE, IMPROVE AND MAINTAIN THE PURITY OF THE BLOOD OF HORSES OF THE ARABIAN BREED AND ITS DERIVATIVES AND TO PROMOTE PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND THE SCIENCE OF THE BREEDING OF ARABIAN HORSES BY CONTINUING THE INTRODUCTION OF ARABIAN BLOOD INTO THE BREEDING OF LIGHT HORSES. B) FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, TO PROMOTE AND FACILITATE THE ACQUISITION AND DISTRIBUTION OF THE KNOWLEDGE IN ALL COUNTRIES OF THE HISTORY, CARE AND TREATMENT OF HORSES OF THE ARABIAN BREED AND ITS DERIVATIVES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Newbarn Farm
Forthampton
Gloucester
GL19 4QD
- Phone:
- 01684274455
- Email:
- wahoexecsec@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window