Financial history THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAUX

Charity number: 279057
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £99.11m £93.81m £109.76m £139.12m £162.63m
Total expenditure £103.95m £94.17m £109.09m £137.13m £168.82m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A £566.00k £0
Income from government grants £93.43m £61.12m £75.91m £95.85m £111.63m
Income - Donations and legacies £1.19m £87.00k £283.00k £267.00k £636.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £97.12m £93.44m £108.88m £138.19m £161.42m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £190.00k £72.00k £200.00k £285.00k £29.00k
Income - Other £612.00k £215.00k £395.00k £381.00k £543.00k
Income - Legacies £916.00k £49.00k £237.00k £17.00k £140.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £103.91m £94.13m £109.06m £136.87m £157.26m
Expenditure - Raising funds £37.00k £37.00k £30.00k £262.00k £717.00k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £984.00k £1.06m £1.10m £11.00m
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £42.98m £51.54m £75.42m £89.15m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £10.85m