Trustees THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAUX

Charity number: 279057
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
WARREN BUCKLEY Chair 15 January 2013
None on record
JABBAR SARDAR Trustee 29 April 2020
None on record
Finola Mary McDonnell Trustee 31 March 2020
FT FINANCIAL LITERACY AND INCLUSION CAMPAIGN
Recently registered
Lucinda Margaret Bell Trustee 11 October 2018
None on record
JONATHAN MOGFORD Trustee 25 July 2018
WANDSWORTH CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAUX LIMITED
Received: On time
Ann-Marie Harkin Trustee 28 February 2018
None on record
WILL CAVENDISH Trustee 22 August 2017
None on record
ROLANDE ANDERSON Trustee 17 April 2016
ST MUNGO COMMUNITY HOUSING ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Ashok Vaswani Trustee 17 April 2016
PRATHAM UK
Received: On time