Trustees TIPTREE PRIORY HEATH WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity number: 279107
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
M JARMAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rev Christine Ann Eaton | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sue Lucas | Trustee | 11 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Denise Darby | Trustee | 14 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Val Calvert | Trustee | 08 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Joan Dolan | Trustee | 08 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
VERONICA MARY GEISER | Trustee | 25 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
CELIA MARY ELIZABETH BUTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROLE ANN BYSOUTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
J POTTER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.