Accounts and annual returns THE OXFORD AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWS

Charity number: 279141
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 03 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 23 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 23 March 2021 296 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 21 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 15 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required