Financial history THE OXFORD AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWS

Charity number: 279141
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £3.98k £3.13k £3.16k £5.10k £3.79k
Total expenditure £3.37k £5.65k £1.21k £1.48k £4.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A