Trustees THE OXFORD AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWS

Charity number: 279141
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARGARET ANN SIMPSON Chair
MYVISION OXFORDSHIRE
Received: On time
Guy Roger Lawfull Trustee 27 June 2019
MYVISION OXFORDSHIRE
Received: On time
Amanda Ann Tree Trustee 27 June 2019
None on record
Marjorie Ann Davies Trustee 27 June 2019
None on record
Michelle Lawfull Trustee 27 June 2019
None on record
Peter West BSc Trustee 07 November 2016
None on record
BRIDGET CLAIRE DOOLE Trustee 24 October 2014
None on record
MARGARET BRINKHURST Trustee 13 November 2012
None on record
HILARY CHRISTINE BEATON Trustee 21 January 2012
None on record
MISS MANDY WOOD Trustee
NEW MARSTON PASTORAL CENTRE
Overdue by 197 days
DIANA JOAN SHAW Trustee
None on record
LESLEY COURT Trustee
None on record