ST SWITHUN'S CHURCH, EAST GRINSTEAD, RESTORATION TRUST

Charity number: 279191
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £13.18k £8.43k £9.07k £6.55k £11.37k
Total expenditure £58.19k £0 £843 £5.37k £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A