THE CUTLER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grant Making Charity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout London
Governance
- 15 February 1980: Standard registration
- THE TEACHER SUPPORT NETWORK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Education Support Partnership | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.88k | £88 | £32 | £1.43k | £1.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.18k | £2.79k | £972 | £79 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 February 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 10TH AUGUST 1979
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND ONE OR BOTH OF WHOSE PARENTS ARE OR WERE TEACHERS AT ANY SCHOOL OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT MAINTAINED BY THE FORMER LONDON COUNTY COUNCIL OR THE INNER LONDON EDUCATION AUTHORITY WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THOSE PERSONS QUALIFIED AS AFORESAID ONE OR BOTH OF WHOSE PARENTS ARE DECEASED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Education Support Partnership
40A DRAYTON PARK
LONDON
N5 1EW
- Phone:
- 02076972750
- Email:
- info@edsupport.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window