THE GEORGE AND MARY CROSFIELD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 279427
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 13 March 2021 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 06 March 2020 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 25 February 2019 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 04 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 17 June 2017 132 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required