TRINITY IN CAMBERWELL

Charity number: 279447
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £123.13k £114.08k £120.09k £122.24k £109.21k
Total expenditure £82.17k £85.19k £94.92k £112.58k £80.19k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A