Financial history MISSES BARRIE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 279459
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £228.50k £231.64k £231.17k £233.74k £185.40k
Total expenditure £246.10k £348.98k £356.56k £176.41k £206.71k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A