Financial history THE WELLINGTON REYNOLDS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 279497
Charity reporting is overdue by 500 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £9.22k £10.14k £5.37k £5.41k £9.34k
Total expenditure £8.59k £10.01k £4.77k £5.48k £8.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A