THE A J FREEMAN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 279522
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 12 February 2021 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 05 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 01 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 30 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 03 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required