THE FRIENDS OF HOLY TRINITY CHURCH

Charity Number: 279543
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The preservation and upkeep of Holy Trinity Church, Bradpole, its contents from time to time, and the churchyard.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £16,200
Total expenditure: £760

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Dorset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 January 1961: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Martin Whiting Chair 20 June 2019
None on record
Lesley Carol Anne Dove Trustee 13 June 2024
None on record
STEVEN DOVE Trustee 15 June 2023
None on record
Rev JANIS ELIZABETH MOORE Trustee 16 June 2022
None on record
MAUREEN ROSBROOK Trustee 23 June 2016
None on record
CHRISTINE MANSELL Trustee 18 June 2015
None on record
WENDY CARNELL Trustee 18 June 2015
None on record
JOHN ADAMS Trustee 18 June 2015
None on record
SHEENA TOMKINS Trustee 06 September 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.02k £10.85k £7.51k £8.86k £16.20k
Total expenditure £2.97k £649 £17.30k £1.20k £760
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 24 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 04 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 20 MAY 1982
Charitable objects
FOR THE GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY CALLED THE FRIENDS OF HOLY TRNITY CHURCH IN THE PARISH OF BRIDPORT, IN THE COUNTY OF DORSET IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM EXPEDIENT IN THE INTERESTS OF THE LAST MENTIONED CHARITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 01 January 1961 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Old Mill
Loders
Bridport
DT6 4NN
Phone:
01308 427159
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available