RED LODGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 279560
Charity reporting is overdue by 1761 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011
Total gross income £1.45k £882 £986 £355 £0
Total expenditure £2.54k £2.63k £1.82k £1.88k £610
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A