ST PANCRAS PARENTS TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 279612
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 14 July 2021 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 14 July 2021 409 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 14 November 2019 167 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 18 July 2018 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 22 September 2017 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required