ST PANCRAS PARENTS TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 279612
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
  • 28 March 1980: Standard registration
  • 09 September 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 26 April 2012: Re-registered
  • 10 January 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 23 April 2015: Re-registered
  • 09 January 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 31 March 2017: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE FRIENDS OF ST PANCRAS SCHOOL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property