CENTRE STAGE LONDON

Charity number: 279647
Charity reporting is up to date (62 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 08 April 2021 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 08 April 2021 62 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 31 October 2020 269 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 31 October 2020 269 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 23 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 23 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 07 May 2018 91 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 07 May 2018 91 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 08 June 2017 123 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 08 June 2017 123 days late Download