Accounts and annual returns CENTRE LINKS TRUST

Charity number: 279674
Charity reporting is overdue by 1461 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Annual return not yet received
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Accounts not yet received
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 365 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 365 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 730 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 730 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1096 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1096 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1461 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1461 days