Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF PETERHOUSE

Charity number: 279697
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 19 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 19 July 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 09 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 09 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 23 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 23 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 07 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 07 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2017 03 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 03 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window