Trustees FRIENDS OF PETERHOUSE

Charity number: 279697
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IAN PETERS Chair
CANAL & RIVER TRUST
Received: On time
Helen Annette Thornley Trustee 21 October 2021
None on record
Ashley Caleb Abrahams Trustee 29 June 2020
THE ENGLISH EIGHT CLUB
Received: On time
ZsiZsi Amber LeScrooge Trustee 12 October 2017
None on record
QIAN QI QUAN Trustee 08 March 2017
None on record
LORD THOMAS OF GRESFORD Trustee 25 February 2015
GRESFORD & DISTRICT WAR MEMORIAL COMMUNITY CENTRE TRUST
Received: On time
Dr STEPHEN WILLIAM PETER HAMPTON Trustee 26 July 2013
THE MASTER (OR KEEPER) AND FELLOWS OF PETERHOUSE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE
Received: On time
EDWARD COOPER NEVE Trustee
None on record
David Jeffreys Trustee
None on record
CHRISTOPHER CHARLES BIDDULPH DUFFETT Trustee
None on record
SIR PAUL HYACINTH MORGAN Trustee
None on record
ELIZABETH KRELING Trustee
None on record
MICHAEL DENZIL HOLMES Trustee
None on record