Trustees NORTH KENSINGTON LAW CENTRE

Charity number: 279699
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nadia Nail Trustee 25 May 2021
None on record
Simon Caro Trustee 16 October 2019
None on record
Mary Luisa Hartley Trustee 27 March 2019
None on record
Zarif Khan Trustee 24 October 2018
None on record
Lucy Daniels Trustee 11 April 2018
None on record
Christina Alkaff Trustee 11 April 2018
None on record
Pat Healy Trustee 11 April 2018
None on record