Accounts and annual returns GREAT AND LITTLE HORKESLEY FRIENDSHIP CLUB

Charity number: 279728
Charity reporting is overdue by 836 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 105 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 105 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 470 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 470 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 836 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 836 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 04 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required