FRIENDS OF BOYTON CHURCH

Charity number: 279734
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 29 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 20 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 10 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 22 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 20 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required