SHARING OF MINISTRIES ABROAD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SOMA UK works for the transformation of individuals and churches and the healing of communities and their lands through the renewing power of the Holy Spirit . This is through intercession and sending and receiving short-term mission teams across the Anglican Communion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
400 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Burundi
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- India
- Kenya
- Madagascar
- Mauritius
- Mozambique
- New Zealand
- Nigeria
- Pakistan
- Rwanda
- Singapore
- South Africa
- South Sudan
- Sudan
- Tanzania
- Uganda
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- S O M A (Working name)
- SOMA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ven Kevin Thomas Roberts | Chair | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Julie Faith Morgan | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Nye | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Kenneth James Wiebe | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Rachael Kisakye Sanya | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Wayne Philip Massey | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER ANNE BROWN | Trustee | 30 October 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £131.20k | £78.73k | £67.01k | £142.27k | £118.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £150.69k | £86.95k | £85.07k | £105.71k | £125.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12 FEBRUARY 1980 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 21 OCTOBER 2008 AND 1 DECEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AMONG PEOPLE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY THE MINISTRY OF EVANGELISM AND SPIRITUAL RENEWAL AND THE SHARING OF GOD GIVEN GIFTS AND SPIRITUAL RESOURCES.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Soma UK
295 Chiswick High Road
Suite 132
London
W4 4HH
- Phone:
- +44 7311 825415
- Email:
- info@somauk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window