Trustees THE BAND TRUST

Charity number: 279802
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
THE HON MRS NICHOLAS WALLOP MBE Chair 25 June 1984
None on record
Joanne Marie Dickinson Trustee 17 July 2023
None on record
Henry Robert Newton Wallop Trustee 20 February 2018
None on record
BARTHOLOMEW GUY PEERLESS Trustee 06 June 2016
CREATIVE MENTORS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE BLACKFORD CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE MACKINTOSH FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE R & CH CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE J AND D HAMBRO CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: 101 days late
THE GEOFF & FIONA SQUIRE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE MARTIN SMITH FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE CHARLES RUSSELL SPEECHLYS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
VICTORIA URANIA SOPHIA WALLOP Trustee 25 February 2014
None on record
THE HON Nicholas Wallop Trustee 07 May 1996
None on record