THE FRIENDS OF ST MICHAEL'S CHURCH, ST ALBANS

Charity number: 279810
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 21 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 03 January 2019 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 18 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required