Trustees VERNACULAR ARCHITECTURE GROUP

Charity number: 279839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Adrian Gareth Green Chair 06 January 2018
THE BOW TRUST (DURHAM) LIMITED
Received: On time
THE CITY OF DURHAM TRUST
Received: On time
DURHAM VICTORIA COUNTY HISTORY TRUST
Received: On time
VALE OF PICKERING RESEARCH TRUST
Received: On time
Judith Alfrey Trustee 24 January 2022
CANOLFAN CYMUNEDOL DERWENLAS COMMUNITY CENTRE
Received: On time
Hannah Kingsbury Trustee 24 January 2022
None on record
Anne Jennifer Bishop Trustee 24 January 2022
None on record
Professor Niall Alexander Logan BSc PhD Trustee 13 January 2021
None on record
Dr Catriona Mackie FSA Trustee 13 January 2021
None on record
Rebecca Helen Lane Trustee 04 January 2020
None on record
Dr Ian David Hinton Trustee 04 January 2020
None on record
Beverley Jayne Kerr Trustee 05 January 2019
None on record
Lauren Wilson Trustee 06 January 2018
None on record
Tansy Collins Trustee 07 January 2017
None on record
Dr Adam Neil Menuge FSC, IHBC Trustee 07 January 2016
None on record
Claire Margaret Jeffery Trustee 07 January 2016
None on record
MR NICK HILL Trustee
None on record
NAT ALCOCK Trustee
None on record
LORRAINE SARA MOOR Trustee
None on record