LAUNCHPAD READING

Charity number: 279859
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 03 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 11 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 11 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 23 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 23 January 2017 On time Download