LAUNCHPAD READING

Charity number: 279859
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £2.92m £3.16m £3.94m £3.56m £3.31m
Total expenditure £2.50m £2.76m £3.34m £2.85m £2.95m
Income from government contracts £520.29k £592.48k £661.93k £619.52k £632.00k
Income from government grants £1.00k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £321.41k £289.09k £579.70k £736.27k £709.45k
Income - Other trading activities £13.33k £29.18k £0 £0 £141.30k
Income - Charitable activities £2.58m £2.84m £3.32m £2.70m £2.46m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.26k £3.98k £793 £2.61k £3.23k
Income - Other £0 £0 £39.12k £118.81k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.39m £2.65m £3.22m £2.72m £2.75m
Expenditure - Raising funds £113.64k £110.64k £122.89k £129.77k £197.47k
Expenditure - Governance £20.97k £22.32k £21.02k £24.73k £28.41k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0