LAUNCHPAD READING

Charity number: 279859
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Deborah Jane Edwardds Trustee 23 January 2020 None on record
William Montague Trustee 30 November 2017 None on record
Philip Jones Trustee 07 September 2017 None on record
Ian Haslam Trustee 26 January 2017 None on record
Hannah Powell Trustee 24 September 2015 None on record
MATT ANDREWS Trustee None on record
Suzanne Stallard Chair 26 January 2017 None on record
Sean Sutcliffe Trustee 18 September 2014 None on record
HELEN WARING Trustee 24 December 2012 None on record