LETCHWORTH AND BALDOCK DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 279860
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity fosters the aims of The Scout Association to help young people achieve their full physical, intellectual, social and spiritual potential as individuals, as responsible citizens and as Members of their local, national and international communities. The Scouting method is to give young people the opportunity to 'learn by doing' in partnership with adults.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £84,853
Total expenditure: £93,363

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 April 1980: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sophie Malone Trustee 11 May 2023
None on record
Glenn Read Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Clair Calver Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Elizabeth Aird Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Alan James Mann Trustee 13 May 2021
None on record
Russell Paul Wake Trustee 12 May 2021
None on record
Robert Andrew Coldrey Trustee 12 March 2020
None on record
Paul David Grosvenor Tyler Trustee 13 May 2019
None on record
Kenneth George Osborne Trustee 09 May 2019
None on record
George Robert Muge Trustee 10 May 2018
None on record
HAYLEY PALMER Trustee 10 May 2018
None on record
Jacob Adam Grosvenor Tyler Trustee 10 April 2018
4TH LETCHWORTH SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
Wendy Tierney Trustee 04 May 2015
None on record
APRYL GOODWIN Trustee 12 March 2014
None on record
JEREMY CROXFORD Trustee 22 October 2012
STEVENAGE AND DISTRICT RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
PHILIP CHARSLEY Trustee 16 October 2012
None on record
MICHAEL JOHN DURRANT Trustee
None on record
CHRISTOPHER KING Trustee
WYMONDLEY WOOD SCOUT AND GUIDE ACTIVITY CENTRE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £57.17k £84.31k £32.61k £45.88k £84.85k
Total expenditure £58.47k £40.76k £51.56k £45.22k £93.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £600 £10.00k £12.31k £2.67k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 19 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 June 2024 232 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

19 June 2024 232 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 29 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
11 Kingsfield House
Hadrian Way
BALDOCK
SG7 6FR
Phone:
01462895665