THE PUTNEY PARISH DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 279868
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £0 £5 £11 £0 £6
Total expenditure £0 £60 £60 £3.53k £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A