Dogfen lywodraethu THE CHARTERED SOCIETY OF PHYSIOTHERAPY CHARITABLE TRUST
Rhif yr elusen: 279882
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 21/03/1980 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 13/02/2003 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 08/04/2003 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 06/01/2012 as amended on 18 Dec 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF HUMAN SUFFERING AND THE PROTECTION OR PRESERVATION OF PUBLIC HEATLH NY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND RESEARCH IN SUBJECTS RELEVANT TO THE PRACTICE OF PHYSIOTHERAPY AND KINDRED FORMS OF TREATMENT.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.