Trustees THE CHARTERED SOCIETY OF PHYSIOTHERAPY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 279882
Charity reporting is overdue by 124 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Joanna Margaret Jackson Chair 02 April 2018
THE CHARTERED SOCIETY OF PHYSIOTHERAPY CHARITABLE TRUST
Overdue by 124 days
Dr Jane Frances Hislop Trustee 01 January 2023
THE CHARTERED SOCIETY OF PHYSIOTHERAPY CHARITABLE TRUST
Overdue by 124 days
Dr Thomas William Wainwright Trustee 04 October 2022
THE CHARTERED SOCIETY OF PHYSIOTHERAPY CHARITABLE TRUST
Overdue by 124 days
Dr Catherine Jane Minns Lowe Trustee 16 September 2022
THE CHARTERED SOCIETY OF PHYSIOTHERAPY CHARITABLE TRUST
Overdue by 124 days
Christopher Terence Garcia Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
William David FitzGerald Trustee 02 April 2018
None on record
Rekha Soni Trustee 02 April 2018
THE CHARTERED SOCIETY OF PHYSIOTHERAPY CHARITABLE TRUST
Overdue by 124 days