TIPTON ST JOHN PARENT TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 279908
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 17 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 11 October 2020 103 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 22 November 2019 145 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 06 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required