TIPTON ST JOHN PARENT TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 279908
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £7.20k £4.63k £3.94k £4.11k £2.99k
Total expenditure £4.20k £6.74k £2.67k £3.53k £2.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A