ST BERNADETTES PARENT-TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 279966
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 August 2020 07 July 2021 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 31 July 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 29 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 16 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 12 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 12 July 2017 On time Download