THE MAYOR OF SOUTHWARK'S COMMON GOOD TRUST

Charity number: 280011
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 17 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required