ST BUDEAUX COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 280128
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £38.92k £50.20k £59.45k £40.57k £41.00k
Total expenditure £35.56k £39.62k £60.19k £50.34k £45.98k
Income from government contracts £9.92k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £6.00k N/A £2.67k